|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4645.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6177.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3586.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3302.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|