California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB888 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 888INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee JANUARY 20, 2010 An act to amend Section 23501 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 888, as introduced, Yee. Corporation income tax. The Corporation Tax Law imposes a corporation income tax at a rate of 8.84% upon a corporation's net income, as specified. This bill would make a technical, nonsubstantive change to those provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 23501 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 23501. (a) There shall be imposed upon  every   each  corporation, other than a bank, for each taxable year, a tax at the rate of 7.6 percent upon its net income derived from sources within this state on or after January 1, 1937, other than income for any period for which the corporation is subject to taxation under Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 23101), according to or measured by its net income. (b) For calendar or fiscal years ending after June 30, 1973, the rate of tax shall be 9 percent instead of 7.6 percent as provided by subdivision (a). (c) For calendar or fiscal years ending after December 31, 1979, the rate of tax shall be the rate specified for those years by Section 23151.