05/28/2010 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
05/10/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/10/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 3474.) To Assembly. | |||
05/05/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3427.) | |||
04/23/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3001.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/10/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/04/2010 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
01/22/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | |||
01/21/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |