01/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2010. | |||
01/07/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
01/05/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |||
12/17/2009 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 2607.) To enrollment. | |||
12/15/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
12/10/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3638.) To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3638.) To Senate. | |||
09/03/2009 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |||
09/02/2009 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico. | |||
08/17/2009 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 517.) To Assembly. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |