|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3548.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3308.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|