05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/26/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3015.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/11/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
01/27/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |||
01/26/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |