09/24/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/23/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/19/2010 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4654.) To enrollment. | |||
08/12/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/12/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6183.) To Senate. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 5841.) To third reading. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Heard in Committee on June 16.) | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3376.) To Assembly. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.) | |||
03/10/2010 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
01/27/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |||
01/26/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |