07/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/28/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |||
07/24/2009 | In Senate. Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 1810.) To enrollment. | |||
07/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 2569.) To Senate. | |||
07/16/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
07/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.) | |||
07/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2466.) | |||
06/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 517.) To Assembly. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |