BILL NUMBER: SB 903ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 7, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wright JANUARY 26, 2010 An act to add Section 200.5 to the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 903, Wright. Penalty collections: limitations. Existing law provides that an action by the Division of Labor Standards Enforcement within the Department of Industrial Relations for collection of a statutory penalty or fee must be commenced within one year after the penalty or fee became final. This bill would extend the period within which the division may commence a collection action, as defined, from one year to 3 years. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 200.5 is added to the Labor Code, to read: 200.5. (a) Notwithstanding any provision of this code or Section 340 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to collect a civil penalty, fee, or penalty fee under this division, the Division of Labor Standards Enforcement shall commence an action within three years from the date the penalty or fee became final. Upon commencement of an action, the clerk of the superior court shall enter judgment immediately in conformity therewith. (b) This section applies only to penalty assessments or fees that became final on or after the effective date of the act adding this section. (c) For purposes of this section, "commence an action" means to file a request for entry of judgment on a civil penalty or fee with the clerk of the superior court of the relevant county.