|
07/15/2010
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3334.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3002.)
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|