|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4658.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6236.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6174.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 3651.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3443.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|