|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 1758.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2488.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 823.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 754.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 638.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|