LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB913
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB913
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB913
Action History
04/01/2010
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/24/2010
Set for hearing April 14.
02/11/2010
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
01/29/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
01/28/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.