|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 700, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4924.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6672.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6425.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3736.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3669.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3299.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3037.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|