06/14/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/10/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
05/04/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/11/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/02/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | |||
02/01/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |