|
06/14/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Yee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 12. Noes 18. Page 3787.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3787.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3593.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3298.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|