|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4884.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6365.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 3325.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3299.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|