|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4659.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6235.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3476.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3443.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|