|
06/28/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5813.) From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Heard in committee on June 24.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3413.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3187.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|