|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 616, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4977.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6740.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6423.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3650.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3445.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|