|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 314, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4895.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6502.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 3375.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3334.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|