08/02/2010 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30). | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
05/06/2010 | To Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3197.) To Assembly. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3038.) | |||
03/12/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/08/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time. | |||
02/05/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |