|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4884.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6364.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5726.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 3740.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3669.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3299.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3102.)
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|