02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/10/2009 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
06/04/2009 | Set for hearing June 10. | |||
05/18/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/15/2009 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
02/05/2009 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |||
01/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |