LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB960
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB960
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB960
Action History
04/05/2010
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3083.) Reconsideration granted.
03/19/2010
Set for hearing April 5.
03/15/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
02/18/2010
To Com. on EQ.
02/08/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
02/05/2010
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.