|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4908.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6493.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6435.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on E. & R. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3734.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3101.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|