|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3732.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading. (May 28 amended measure version corrected June 2.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3293.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3210.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|