05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/26/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3003.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/11/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |