|
06/29/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 3793.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3294.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|