04/14/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/12/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/18/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/17/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/11/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |