05/13/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/19/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3299.) | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/22/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |