|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 343, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2285.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2921.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 25.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1142.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 555.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|