08/11/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/11/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 4447.) To Assembly. | |||
08/10/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4435.) | |||
08/05/2010 | Set for hearing August 9. | |||
08/03/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/02/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4319.) | |||
07/08/2010 | Set for hearing July 15. | |||
07/01/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/28/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/18/2010 | Set for hearing June 29. | |||
06/17/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2010 | Set for hearing June 22. | |||
05/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |