08/02/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
07/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) | |||
06/29/2010 | Reconsideration of favorable vote granted in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4167.) | |||
06/17/2010 | Set for hearing June 29. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |