05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/12/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
05/10/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.) | |||
04/08/2010 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |