08/02/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4306.) To Assembly. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4167.) | |||
06/17/2010 | Set for hearing June 29. | |||
05/11/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3429.) | |||
04/29/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. (For vote only.) | |||
04/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/25/2010 | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |