LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB99
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB99
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB99
Compare Versions
SB99 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB99 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB99 Amended August 31, 2009
SB99 Amended May 12, 2009
SB99 Introduced January 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB99 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB99 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB99 Amended August 31, 2009
SB99 Amended May 12, 2009
SB99 Introduced January 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare