|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4896.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6503.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6429.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3741.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|