05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/17/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/12/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/07/2010 | Set for hearing May 17. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3185.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/24/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/10/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |