05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/22/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3210.) | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (April 5 amended version corrected April 6.) | |||
03/12/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/10/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |