08/23/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/23/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
08/11/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
08/05/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/05/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6053.) To Senate. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
05/17/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/17/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3542.) To Assembly. | |||
05/12/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/04/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3428.) | |||
04/09/2010 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/08/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 19. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/10/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |