California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SBX23 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 02/20/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SBX2 3CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 1 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE FEBRUARY 20, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR FEBRUARY 20, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE FEBRUARY 14, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senators Florez and Denham (Coauthor: Assembly Member Galgiani) FEBRUARY 11, 2009 An act to add Section 44282.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 3, Florez. Air pollution: grants: farm equipment. Existing law gives to the State Air Resources Board the primary responsibility for the control of emissions from motor vehicles. The state board is required to administer the Carl Moyer Memorial Air Quality Standards Attainment Program to provide grants to offset the incremental cost of projects that reduce covered emissions from covered sources. The state board is required to establish and update grant criteria and guidelines for covered vehicle projects. This bill would require an off-road project that involves farm equipment to be deemed to have a minimum project life of at least 10 years. The bill would authorize a grant to be awarded for those projects involving farm equipment regardless of the time period between the date the application for funding was submitted and the compliance date required by any local, state, or federal statute, regulation, rule, memorandum of agreement, memorandum of understanding, or other legal restriction or legally binding document that requires the change in equipment, vehicle, or operation involved in the project, provided the project is not funded after the date for compliance. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 44282.5 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 44282.5. (a) An off-road project that involves farm equipment shall be deemed to have a minimum project life of at least 10 years. (b) A grant may be awarded for a project described in subdivision (a) regardless of the time period between the date the application for funding was submitted and the compliance date required by any local, state, or federal statute, regulation, rule, memorandum of agreement, memorandum of understanding, or other legal restriction or legally binding document that requires the change in equipment, vehicle, or operation involved in the project, provided the project is not funded after the date for compliance.