LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX310
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX310
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX310
Compare Versions
SBX310 Chaptered February 20, 2009
SBX310 Enrolled February 19, 2009
SBX310 Amended February 14, 2009
SBX310 Amended January 13, 2009
SBX310 Introduced January 5, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SBX310 Chaptered February 20, 2009
SBX310 Enrolled February 19, 2009
SBX310 Amended February 14, 2009
SBX310 Amended January 13, 2009
SBX310 Introduced January 5, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare