06/30/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |||
06/30/2009 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
06/30/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
06/29/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 16. Page 186.) To enrollment. | |||
06/28/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/28/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 279.) Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 285.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 31. Page 286.) To Senate. | |||
01/13/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/12/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/12/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 21.) To Assembly. | |||
01/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/07/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/05/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |