10/12/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session. | |||
10/10/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/28/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
09/11/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 254.) To enrollment. | |||
08/31/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/31/2009 | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 375.) Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 376.) Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 377.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 37. Page 377.) To Senate. | |||
06/28/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 279.) Placed on third reading. | |||
01/13/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/12/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/12/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 21.) To Assembly. | |||
01/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/07/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/05/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |