03/27/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session. | |||
03/27/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
03/26/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
03/26/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
03/26/2009 | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 190.) Read second time. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 191.) To Senate. | |||
03/23/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 118.) To Assembly. | |||
03/19/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/16/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |