10/26/2009 | Died on file. | |||
03/17/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
03/16/2009 | Read third time. Amended. Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |||
02/15/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
01/13/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/12/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/12/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 17.) To Assembly. | |||
01/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/07/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/05/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |