02/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session. | |||
02/20/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
02/19/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
02/19/2009 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 67.) To enrollment. | |||
02/15/2009 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 49.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. | |||
02/14/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
02/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 72.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 11. Page 72.) To Senate. | |||
01/13/2009 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/12/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/12/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 18.) To Assembly. | |||
01/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/07/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/05/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |