07/24/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. Died on file. | |||
07/24/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 89.) To Senate. | |||
07/23/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 54.) To third reading. | |||
07/13/2009 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 19.) To Assembly. | |||
07/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/06/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |