07/28/2009 | Approved by Governor. Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |||
07/24/2009 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 68.) To enrollment. | |||
07/23/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
07/23/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 53.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 56.) To Senate. | |||
07/13/2009 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 20.) To Assembly. | |||
07/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/06/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |